Baskin v. American Optical Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: George Lee Baskin
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC and Sperian Respiratory Protection USA, LLC
Not Classified By Court: American Optical Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv01787
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. (cwa)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified text/linkage on 11/5/2021 (cwa).
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.(Kemmerly, McNeil)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC (Kemmerly, McNeil)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Jay Christopher Zainey, Jr for George Lee Baskin. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/05/2021. (ko)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. (cwa)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Optical Corporation (Blum, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by American Optical Corporation.(Blum, Thomas) Modified text/linkage on 9/30/2021 (cwa).
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by George Lee Baskin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Centola, Lawrence)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Blum, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021--7072 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9042954) filed by American Optical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 List of Parties and Pleadings, #5 Statement Notice to Plaintiff, #6 Statement)Attorney Thomas R. Blum added to party American Optical Corporation(pty:selreq).(Blum, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin v. American Optical Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Thomas R. Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lee Baskin
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Jason Zachary Landry
Represented By: Jay Christopher Zainey, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Adam D Whitworth
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Represented By: McNeil James Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sperian Respiratory Protection USA, LLC
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Curtis James Case
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?