Slade v. Webre et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Paul Slade
Defendant: Craig Webre and Louisiana State
Case Number: 2:2021cv01813
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Ryan Paul Slade. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2021. It is therefore RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous, malicious, for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 11/12/21.(cg)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $3.54 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Ryan Paul Slade in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 10/5/21.(cg)(Financial and Sheriff)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Paul Slade. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (sdp)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ryan Paul Slade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sdp) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/6/2021) (bwn). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/6/2021) (bwn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slade v. Webre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Paul Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Webre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?