Bell v. Hooper et al
Plaintiff: Dwight L Bell, Sr
Defendant: Tim Hooper
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv01817
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Dwight L. Bell, Sr.'s petition is construed in part as a motion for authorization for the District Court to consider the second or successive claims raised therein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petition is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals under the authority of 28 U.S.C. 1631, for that Court to determine whether petitioner is authorized under 28 U.S.C. 2244(b) to file the instant habeas corpus petition in this Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/14/2021.(mm)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 10/13/2021. (caa)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dwight L Bell, Sr. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (sdp)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5; LAEO69535) filed by Dwight L Bell, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Hooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight L Bell, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?