Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina v. Graf et al
Plaintiff: Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina
Defendant: Steven Graf, Kathryn Graf, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01823
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina (Busenlener, James)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Comapny. (McAuliffe, John) Modified text on 11/9/2021 (ajn).
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kathryn Graf, Steven Graf, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.Attorney John E. McAuliffe, Jr added to party Kathryn Graf(pty:dft), Attorney John E. McAuliffe, Jr added to party Steven Graf(pty:dft), Attorney John E. McAuliffe, Jr added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft).(McAuliffe, John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kathryn Graf, Steven Graf and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ajn)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Kathryn Graf filed by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina re #1 Complaint,. (Busenlener, James)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9051892) filed by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney James Thomas Busenlener added to party Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina(pty:pla).(Busenlener, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina v. Graf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina
Represented By: James Thomas Busenlener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Graf
Represented By: John E. McAuliffe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Graf
Represented By: John E. McAuliffe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: John E. McAuliffe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?