Oliver v. Roehm America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chelsea Oliver
Defendant: Roehm America, LLC, Yolanda Brown and Andrew Stillufsen
Case Number: 2:2021cv01831
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Waivers of Service Executed. **Filing attorney did not convert documents completely prior to filing. When docket clerk reviewed the documents, the information on the forms was able to be edited. Clerk has replaced the images with pdf images that cannot be edited.** (jls)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Yolanda Brown on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Roehm America, LLC on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Andrew Stillufsen on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Yolanda Brown, #2 Executed Waiver of Andrew Stillufsen)(Townsend, Mercedes) (Main Document 4, and Attachments 1 and 2 replaced on 10/25/2021) (jls).
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Roehm America, LLC. (jls)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9052784) filed by Chelsea Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Oliver Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Oliver Summons)Attorney Casey Rose Denson added to party Chelsea Oliver(pty:pla).(Denson, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Roehm America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Oliver
Represented By: Casey Rose Denson
Represented By: Mercedes Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roehm America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Stillufsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?