Flag Boy Properties, LLC v. Carruba et al
Plaintiff: Flag Boy Properties, LLC
Defendant: Roy M. Carruba, Sharon Perilloux Carubba, LA One Contractors, Inc., Jon D Celino, Crescent City Property Redevelopment, LLC, Crescent City Property Redevelopment Association, LLC improperly named Crescent City Property Redevelopment, LLC doing business as Crescent City Property, Roy M. Carubba and Kami Martin Celino
Not Classified By Court: Kami Celino
Counter Claimant: Crescent City Property Services, Inc. and Crescent City Property Redevelopment Association, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Crescent City Property Services, Inc. doing business as Crescent City Property
Case Number: 2:2021cv01900
Filed: October 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING as unopposed #12 Motion to Withdraw. Defendants' Opposition to the Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 11) is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/7/21. (fmm)
December 3, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wendy B Vitter: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/3/2021. The Court discussed with counsel the status of the case, as well as the pending #6 Motion to Remand and the #11 Opposition brief thereto. Counsel for the removing defendants advised that he will be seeking to withdraw his Opposition brief, and that he will be filing a notice of no opposition to the Motion to Remand. (pp)
December 3, 2021 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 Notice (Other). **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 6. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 First MOTION to Withdraw Document. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 11. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Crescent City Property Redevelopment Association, LLC No Opposition to #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Cormier, Amos) Modified text/linkage on 12/3/2021 (jeg).
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Withdraw Document #11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion by Crescent City Property Redevelopment Association, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cormier, Amos) Modified text/linkage on 12/3/2021 (jeg).
December 3, 2021 Filing 11 **WITHDRAWN PER TEXT ORDER, DOC. 17** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Crescent City Property Redevelopment Association, LLC re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Cormier, Amos) Modified text on 12/3/2021 (jeg). Modified on 12/7/2021 (mmv).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Telephone Status Conference scheduled for December 3, 2021 at 10 a.m. is hereby RESET for December 3, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel are instructed to use the dial-in information previously provided by the Court. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter.(fmm)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court First MOTION for Attorney Fees incorporated in Motion to RemandFirst MOTION for Sanctions incorporated in Motion to Remand filed by Flag Boy Properties, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for tomorrow, Friday, December 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (CST). Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel of record. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter.(fmm)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Crescent City Property Redevelopment Association, LLC re #4 Directive . (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Court Service of Process, #2 State Court Pleadings State Court Judgment)(Cormier, Amos) Modified text on 12/1/2021 (jeg).
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court First MOTION for Attorney Fees incorporated in Motion to RemandFirst MOTION for Sanctions incorporated in Motion to Remand. **1.Not necessary to select relief MOTION for Attorney Fees and MOTION for Sanctions for this document. Only the relief MOTION to Remand to State Court is necessary. Clerk modified docket text. 2.Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Service return of Roy Carubba, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Freedman, Jonah) Modified text/events/referral on 11/9/2021 (jeg).
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Cormier, Amos)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crescent City Property Services, Inc. By the Clerk.(bw)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 DEFICIENT. Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Cormier, Amos) Modified on 10/19/2021 (bw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
October 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Flag Boy Properties LLC v. Roy M. Carubba, Sharon, case number 2021-6015 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9067181) filed by Crescent City Property Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Answer & Reconventional Demand, #3 Exhibit Exception to Reconventional Demand, #4 Exhibit Opposition to Exception, #5 Exhibit Answer & Reconventional Demand signed, #6 Exhibit Notice of Change of Address)Attorney Amos Justin Cormier, III added to party Crescent City Property Services, Inc.(pty:cc).(Cormier, Amos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flag Boy Properties, LLC v. Carruba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kami Celino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flag Boy Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jonah Aries Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy M. Carruba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Perilloux Carubba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA One Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon D Celino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent City Property Redevelopment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent City Property Redevelopment Association, LLC improperly named Crescent City Property Redevelopment, LLC doing business as Crescent City Property
Represented By: Amos Justin Cormier, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy M. Carubba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kami Martin Celino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Crescent City Property Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amos Justin Cormier, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Crescent City Property Redevelopment Association, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Crescent City Property Services, Inc. doing business as Crescent City Property
Represented By: Amos Justin Cormier, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?