Wetzel v. Montgomery
Plaintiff: Andrew Wetzel
Defendant: Warren Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2021cv01940
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT entered in favor of the respondent, Warren Montgomery, and against the petitioner Andrew Wetzel, dismissing without prejudice Wetzel's petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/18/2021.(ko)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. FURTHER ORDERED that the #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/18/2021. (ko)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 11/15/2021. (caa)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order by Andrew Wetzel. (js)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Andrew Wetzel. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (js)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Wetzel. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (js)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Andrew Wetzel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Original Deficient Filing, #4 Transmittal Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 11/16/2021. (bw)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 DEFICIENT. PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Andrew Wetzel. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wetzel v. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?