Dickerson v. Bickham et al
Plaintiff: Fard A.R. Dickerson
Defendant: Edward Bickham
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv01972
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Martin LC Feldman
3 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER transferring petition to U.S. Court of Appeals - 5th Circuit to determine if petitioner is allowed to file successive habeas petition in this court. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/19/2021.(sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2021: #1 Transmittal Letter to 5th Cir.) (sa).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/18/2021.(caa)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 Supplement by Fard A.R. Dickerson to #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). (bwn)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/16/2021.(lw)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 11/15/2021. (caa)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fard A.R. Dickerson. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (js)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Fard A.R. Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Original Deficient Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 11/18/2021. (ko) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/29/2021) (ko).
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Fard A.R. Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Bickham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fard A.R. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Bickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?