Delta Marine Support, LLC et al v. Marsh Buggies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Delta Marine Support,LLC, Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C. and Tidewater Dock Inc
Defendant: Marsh Buggies Inc and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02003
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 5/17/2022. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pre-Trial Notice)(mm) (NEF: MJ)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/29/2021.(sbs)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Marsh Buggies Inc. Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party Marsh Buggies Inc(pty:dft).(Mahtook, Robert)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Marsh Buggies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lw)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Marsh Buggies Inc filed by Delta Marine Support,LLC, Tidewater Dock Inc, Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C. re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Morse, Harry)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Marsh Buggies Inc (Filing fee $402 receipt number ALAEDC-9088812) filed by Delta Marine Support,LLC, Tidewater Dock Inc, Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party Delta Marine Support,LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C.(pty:pla), Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party Tidewater Dock Inc(pty:pla).(Morse, Harry) Modified text on 11/2/2021 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Marine Support, LLC et al v. Marsh Buggies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Marine Support,LLC
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C.
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tidewater Dock Inc
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh Buggies Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Represented By: Julie I. Faulk
Represented By: Kay Austin Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Represented By: Julie I. Faulk
Represented By: Kay Austin Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?