Washington v. Aucoin et al
Plaintiff: Cordero Washington
Defendant: Michael E. Aucoin, Knight Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, Knight Transportation Technologies, Inc., Progressive Security Insurance Company, Edward M Aucoin and Knight Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02094
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Attorneys. FURTHER ORDER that Plaintiff participate in the preliminary conference scheduled for Thursday, 1/13/2022, at 10:30 a.m., as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/9/2021.(CC: Cordero Washington via USPS) (pp)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Withdraw John D. Sileo as Attorney .**Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw John D. Sileo, Casey W. Moll and the Law Offices of John D. Sileo, LLC as Attorney by Cordero Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Sileo, John) Modified text on 12/7/2021 (pp).
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - The Preliminary Conference currently scheduled for December 2, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, JANUARY 13, 2022 AT 10:30 A.M. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance (List of Parties and) by Michael E. Aucoin, Knight Transportation Insurance Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 List of Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 1, #3 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 2, #4 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 3, #5 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 4, #6 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 5, #7 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 6, #8 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 7, #9 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 8, #10 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 9, #11 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 10, #12 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 11, #13 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 12, #14 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 13, #15 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 14, #16 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 15, #17 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 16, #18 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 17, #19 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 18)(Aucoin, Ralph)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2021-04187 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9105456) filed by Knight Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, Michael E. Aucoin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Filing, #3 Verification, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)Attorney Ralph J. Aucoin, Jr added to party Michael E. Aucoin(pty:dft), Attorney Ralph J. Aucoin, Jr added to party Knight Transportation Insurance Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Aucoin, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Aucoin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cordero Washington
Represented By: John D. Sileo
Represented By: Casey William Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Aucoin
Represented By: Ralph J. Aucoin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Ralph J. Aucoin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M Aucoin
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Represented By: Kristopher Michael Gould
Represented By: Ralph J. Aucoin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Represented By: Kristopher Michael Gould
Represented By: Ralph J. Aucoin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?