G.K. v. D.M.
Plaintiff: G.K.
Defendant: D.M.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02242
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
2 Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian M. Delaurentis. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/01/2022. (ko) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2022: #1 Notice) (ko).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Reallotment Case Sheet)(ajn)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. DeLaurentis (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9201245) by D.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mr. DeLaurentis, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Courson, James)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Motion Hearing held on 1/26/2022 re #10 MOTION to Compel Rule 26(F) Conference filed by G.K. and #12 MOTION for Protective Order filed by D.M. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel #10 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The parties must hold a Rule 26(f) conference on or before Friday, 2/4/2021, but Plaintiffs request for fees and costs is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Protective Order #12 seeking a stay of discovery pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss #8 is DENIED. (Court Reporter Nichelle Wheeler.) (caa)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the hearing on #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is hereby continued to 2/9/2022, on the papers. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 01/26/2022.(ko)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by D.M. re #12 MOTION for Protective Order. (caa)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 1/25/2022. (caa)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by G.K. re #10 MOTION to Compel Rule 26(F) Conference. (caa)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 1/25/2022. (caa)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order by D.M. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Courson, James)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Rule 26(F) Conference by G.K. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Dodson, Michael) Modified text on 1/25/2022 (lw).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Exhibits UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 1/19/2022. (sa)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 1 & 2 of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Under Seal by G.K. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Manual - Exh. 1 Unredacted, #4 Exhibit Manual - Exh. 2 Unredacted)(Dodson, Michael) Modified text on 1/19/2022 (sa).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by G.K. re #12 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2-Redacted)(Dodson, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2022: #3 SEALED Unredacted Ex. 1, #4 SEALED Unredacted Exh. 2) (sa).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by D.M. re #10 MOTION to Compel Rule 26(F) Conference . (Courson, James)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING Request for Oral Argument - IT IS ORDERED that #10 MOTION to Compel Rule 26(F) Conference, and #12 MOTION for Protective Order, are hereby SET for oral argument on Wednesday, January 26, 2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault, 500 Poydras Street, Room B-421, in person unless otherwise notified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 1/14/2022.(sa)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Supplemental Memorandum filed by G.K., in Opposition of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (ko)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 01/12/2022. (ko)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by D.M. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (ko)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is continued to 1/26/2022, on the papers. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 01/12/2022.(ko)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8) by G.K.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8))(Dodson, Michael)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by D.M.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Courson, James)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order by D.M.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Conference, #3 Exhibit, #4 Notice of Submission)(Courson, James)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by G.K. regarding #10 MOTION to Compel Rule 26(F) Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Rule 26(F) Conference by G.K.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Dodson, Michael)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by G.K. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from D. Courson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from D. Courson)(Dodson, Michael)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by D.M. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Courson, James) Modified text on 12/27/2021 (jls).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by D.M. re #3 Notice of Removal, pursuant to #4 Directive. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Courson, James) Modified text/linkage on 12/22/2021 (jls).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to D.M. answer due date EXTENDED through 12/23/2021. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/14/2021. (sa)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Notice of Removal, by D.M.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Courson, James)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk in Compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #3 SEALED Notice of Removal, filed by D.M. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *SEALED* NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 21-7670 "E-7" filed on 12/7/2021 by D.M. (Filing fee $ 402), Receipt: LAE070491 (sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sa). .
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to File UNDER SEAL and to Proceed using Party Initials. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/10/2021. (sa)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL and to Proceed using Party Initials by D.M. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Non-Confidential, #2 Notice of Request to Seal)(sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2021: #3 SEALED Memo in Support) (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.K. v. D.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.K.
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Danielle Christen Teutonico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.M.
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Represented By: Brian M. Delaurentis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?