LeBlanc v. Forest River, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael LeBlanc
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02352
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Forest River, Inc. on 1/7/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. (Johnson, Ryan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Forest River, Inc.. (jeg)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Forest River, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9155805) filed by Michael LeBlanc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Michael LeBlanc(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBlanc v. Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Richard Collins Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?