Varnado v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Samuel W. Varnado
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02406
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Samuel W. Varnado re #4 Order (Dalton, Richard)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against FCA US LLC filed by Samuel W. Varnado.(Dalton, Richard)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Varnado is hereby ordered to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed due to the absence of diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/10/2022.(pp)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (sa)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against FCA US LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9163645) filed by Samuel W. Varnado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Samuel W. Varnado(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard) Modified on 1/3/2022 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varnado v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel W. Varnado
Represented By: Richard Collins Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?