Morgan v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Michael D. Morgan
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02408
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 8/31/2023. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 2/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice)(clc)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion #22 is GRANTED, and the submission date of defendant's motion for summary judgment #20 is CONTINUED to June 15, 2023, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 02/16/2023.(am)
February 15, 2023 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Michael D. Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Dalton, Richard)
January 26, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2023 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at (877) 873-8018, Access Code: 2994682. Issued by Clerk. (am)
January 25, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice of Submission)(Maxwell, Robert)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Carl Joseph Giffin, Jr for Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/20/2023. (am)
January 20, 2023 Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record. **1. Document contains incorrect Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section M and Magistrate Judge (1).**2. Document contains incorrect name of plaintiff in the caption of the proposed order. Clerk took corrective action and replaced the image. No further action required.** (am)
January 19, 2023 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Enroll)(Maxwell, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/20/2023) (am).
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 12/20/22 Order, #2 Case List)(lag)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting #14 MOTION to Continue. Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2023 11:30 AM before case manager. All parties are to call into the conference at (877) 873-8018, Access Code: 2994682. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/08/2022.(am)
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue by Ford Motor Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Maxwell, Robert)
November 15, 2022 Filing 13 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Continue by Ford Motor Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxwell, Robert) Modified text on 11/16/2022 (am).
November 1, 2022 Filing 12 Witness and Exhibit List by Michael D. Morgan. (Dalton, Richard)
October 31, 2022 Filing 11 Witness and Exhibit List by Ford Motor Company. (Maxwell, Robert)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 12/23/2022. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice)(clc)
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2022 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America for Ford Motor Company (Maxwell, Robert)
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Maxwell, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Ford Motor Company; answer due 2/21/2022. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/13/2022. (clc)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer . **1.Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section M and Magistrate Judge Douglas. 2. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 4 to document 1. No further action necessary.** (pp)
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert W. Maxwell added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft).(Maxwell, Robert) Modified link/text on 1/13/2022 (pp).
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (sa)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ford Motor Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9163672) filed by Michael D. Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Michael D. Morgan(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard) Modified on 1/3/2022 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Morgan
Represented By: Richard Collins Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Robert W. Maxwell
Represented By: Carl Joseph Giffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?