Koong v Talbot
Plaintiff: Joanna Koong
Defendant: Robert Talbot
Case Number: 2:2022cv00038
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 MOTION to Transfer Case. The above-captioned action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary conference set for 02/15/2022 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 02/11/2022.(ko)
February 10, 2022 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Transfer Case by Joanna Koong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sexton, R.)
January 21, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2022 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney R. Gray Sexton and Blane Andrew Wilson for Joanna Koong. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/18/2022. (blg)
January 14, 2022 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record R. Gray Sexton, Blane A. Wilson by Joanna Koong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney R. Gray Sexton added to party Joanna Koong(pty:pla).(Sexton, R.) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (cwa).
January 10, 2022 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-01508. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa)
January 7, 2022 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 1/7/2022, filed. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Filing 21 OPINION on Dismissal. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 20 First RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Dismiss #14 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by Joanna Koong. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Labanowski, Lawrence) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss #14 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Robert Talbot, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Maughan, Roy) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Dismissal denying as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss. By August 20, 2021, Robert Talbot may move dispositively and address the first amended petition..(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on Extension. Koong's motion for extension of time is denied as moot #13 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Joanna Koong. (Labanowski, Lawrence) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 First RESPONSE in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Joanna Koong. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Labanowski, Lawrence) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 First AMENDED PETITION with Jury Demand against Robert Talbot filed by Joanna Koong.(Labanowski, Lawrence) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response by Joanna Koong, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Labanowski, Lawrence) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Robert Talbot, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Affidavit Exhibit E - Affidavit of Robert Talbot)(Maughan, Roy) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 8/22/2020.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(rcastro, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Responsive Pleadings by Robert Talbot, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maughan, Roy) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Remand. Koong's motion to remand is denied #6 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 6/30/2020. Plaintiff's motion to remand taken under advisement. Order to be entered. Appearances: Lawrence Labanowski, Roy Maughan. (Court Reporter: H. Alcarez) (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Robert Talbot. (Maughan, Roy) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Joanna Koong, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order of Remand)(Labanowski, Lawrence) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Roy H. Maughan, Jr., to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Roy Maughan Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Talbot, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2020. (ckrus, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th judicial district Harris county, case number 20-16204 ( Filing fee $ 400) filed by Robert Talbot.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]
April 29, 2020 Full Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Notice of Removal, receipt number HOU095257, filed. (rcastro, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 1/10/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koong v Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Koong
Represented By: Lawrence F Labanowski
Represented By: Sarah Koong
Represented By: Blane Andrew Wilson
Represented By: R. Gray Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Talbot
Represented By: Roy Maughan, Jr
Represented By: Joshua D. Roy
Represented By: Namisha D. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?