Conti 11. Container Schiffahrts-GmbH & Co. KG M.S. v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Plaintiff: Conti 11. Container Schiffahrts-GmbH & Co. KG M.S. MSC Flaminia and Conti 11. Container Schiffarts-GMBH & Co. KG M.S.
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01114
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
3 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0201 Recognition & Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Awards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Considering the foregoing Consent Motion to Expedite (Rec. Doc. 10), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 9) is RESET for submission on July 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/15/22.(cg)
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Conti 11. Container Schiffarts-GMBH & Co. KG M.S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraatz, Arthur)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "A" Declaration of Jean-Christophe Triat, #3 Notice of Submission)(Murphy, Robert)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.; answer due 6/7/2022. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Peter Brooks Sloss added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.(pty:dft).(Sloss, Peter)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Kraatz, Arthur) Modified on 5/4/2022 (cg).
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Kraatz, Arthur) Modified on 5/4/2022 (cg).
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Jay C. Zainey, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/27/2022. (NEF: Judge Barbier, Judge Douglas and Judge van Meerveld)(ajn)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (ajn)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9329367) filed by Conti 11. Container Schiffahrts-GmbH & Co. KG M.S. MSC Flaminia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)Attorney Arthur Raymond Kraatz added to party Conti 11. Container Schiffahrts-GmbH & Co. KG M.S. MSC Flaminia(pty:pla).(Kraatz, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conti 11. Container Schiffahrts-GmbH & Co. KG M.S. v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conti 11. Container Schiffahrts-GmbH & Co. KG M.S. MSC Flaminia
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conti 11. Container Schiffarts-GMBH & Co. KG M.S.
Represented By: Gary Alan Hemphill
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Donald R. Wing
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Samuel Louis Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?