M.S. Rau, LLC v. JZ Modern Art LTD et al
Plaintiff: M.S. Rau, LLC
Defendant: JZ Modern Art LTD, Jerome Zodo and JZ Modern Art, Ltd
Case Number: 2:2022cv01142
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JZ Modern Art, Ltd. (cg)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to JZ Modern Art, Ltd filed by M.S. Rau, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Gelder, Michael)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JZ Modern Art LTD, Jerome Zodo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lw)
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action. (lw)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M.S. Rau, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9332818) filed by M.S. Rau, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Richard K. Leefe added to party M.S. Rau, LLC(pty:pla).(Leefe, Richard) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/27/2022) (lw). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/27/2022) (lw). (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/27/2022) (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.S. Rau, LLC v. JZ Modern Art LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S. Rau, LLC
Represented By: Richard K. Leefe
Represented By: Michael R. Gelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JZ Modern Art LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Zodo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JZ Modern Art, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?