Pellegrini v. Toffoli, et al
Plaintiff: Jay A Pellegrini, Jr.
Defendant: Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London, Acadian Managers LLC, Michael Toffoli and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2022cv01178
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-A, #4 Exhibit 2-B, #5 Exhibit 3)(Myers, Angella)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 MOTION to Continue Submission Date. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the submission date for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 9) is hereby continued to June 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/7/2022.(mm)
June 6, 2022 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue the Submission Date for the Motion to Remand (Doc. 9) to June 29, 2022 by Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Carver, Mark)
June 6, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT STIPULATION by Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London, Jay A. Pelligrini, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal to Extend the Deadline for Answering the Complaint (Carver, Mark) .
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Ronnie L. Johnson, Juston M. O'Brien, Lucas A. Schenk for Acadian Managers LLC, Michael Toffoli. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/3/2022. (mm)
June 2, 2022 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION for More Definite Statement. **1. Caption MUST be changed on all future pleadings to reflect Jay A Pellegrini, Jr. v Michael Toffoli, et al. 2. Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section R and Magistrate (2). 3. Document reflects incorrect case number. All future pleadings should reflect case number 22-1178.** (mm)
June 2, 2022 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record. **1. The Plaintiff is reflected incorrectly in the caption. All future pleadings MUST reflect Jay A Pellegrini, Jr. in the caption for the Plaintiff. In addition, the caption should read as follows for the defendant: Toffoli, et al. 2. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
June 2, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION for More Definite Statement by Acadian Managers LLC, Michael Toffoli. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(O'Brien, Juston)
June 2, 2022 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Ronnie L. Johnson, Lucas Schenk, and Juston M. OBrien by Acadian Managers LLC, Michael Toffoli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Juston M. O'Brien added to party Acadian Managers LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Juston M. O'Brien added to party Michael Toffoli(pty:dft).(O'Brien, Juston) Modified text/event on 6/2/2022 (mm).
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stefan R. Dandelles. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
May 25, 2022 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9374036) by Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Myers, Angella)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 6/15/2022. Clerk took corrective action. (lw)
May 23, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Jay A Pellegrini, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand to State Court, #2 Notice of Submission)(Sunseri, J.) Modified text on 5/24/2022 (lw).
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Myers, Angella) Modified linkage on 5/10/2022 (mm).
May 2, 2022 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Talbot Underwriting Limited, Talbot 2002 Underwriting Capital, Ltd, Validus Holdings, Ltd., American International Group, Inc. as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London. By the Clerk. (mm)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **A corrected Notice of Removal was subsequently provided by filing attorney. Clerk has taken correction action.** (mm)
April 29, 2022 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London identifying corporate parents Talbot Underwriting Limited, Talbot 2002 Underwriting Capital, Ltd, Validus Holdings, Ltd., American International Group, Inc. (Myers, Angella) Modified text/added corporate parents on 5/2/2022 (mm).
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, St. Tammany Parish, case number 22-10978 B (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9337775) filed by Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Applicable State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration) Attorney Angella H. Myers added to party Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London(pty:dft).(Myers, Angella) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/29/2022) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pellegrini v. Toffoli, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay A Pellegrini, Jr.
Represented By: J. Douglas Sunseri
Represented By: Amanda J. Shively
Represented By: Kathryn A.E. Sunseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Angella H. Myers
Represented By: Mark C. Carver
Represented By: Stefan R. Dandelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadian Managers LLC
Represented By: Ronnie L. Johnson
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Lucas A. Schenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Toffoli
Represented By: Ronnie L. Johnson
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Lucas A. Schenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?