Bowie Lumber Associates v. Anadarko OGC Company et al
Plaintiff: Bowie Lumber Associates and Bowie Lumbar Associates, L.L.C.
Defendant: Anadarko OGC Company, Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC, Brammer Engineering Inc, South River Operating, LLC, South River Investments LLC, South River Partners LLC and New South River LLC
Intervenor: John P Gonzalez and Weeks & Gonzalez, APLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01195
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 10/31/2022. Issued by Clerk for Court. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(dp) (Main Document 22 replaced on 6/23/2022) (dp).
June 9, 2022 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Attachments had duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2022 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Court's Order of May 24, 2022 (R. Doc. 16) is AMENDED to DENY the Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record with regard to MICHAEL P. ARATA and his name shall be removed from the docket. Attorney Michael Peter Arata terminated. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 5/25/2022.(mm)
May 24, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Bowie Lumber Associates re #5 MOTION to Remand. (ko)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/24/2022. (ko)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Michael Peter Arata, Rosa E. Acheson for Bowie Lumber Associates. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/24/2022. (ko)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Expedite Consideration. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/24/2022. (ko)
May 24, 2022 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: rec. doc. 5 by Bowie Lumber Associates, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Bartlett, Harvey)
May 23, 2022 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Michael P. Arata and Rosa E. Acheson. **1) Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. **2) Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'.** (jls)
May 20, 2022 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Michael P. Arata and Rosa E. Acheson by Bowie Lumber Associates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daschbach, Emma) Modified text, removed referral on 5/23/2022 (jls).
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko OGC Company re #5 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Laporte, Susan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document. 2. Document lists counsel of record, Rosa E. Acheson, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this court's Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted.** (mm)
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko OGC Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 3)(Kuchler, Deborah) Modified linkage on 5/16/2022 (mm).
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko OGC Company re #6 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kuchler, Deborah)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: rec. doc. 5 by Bowie Lumber Associates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartlett, Harvey)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Bowie Lumber Associates. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Notice of Submission)(Bartlett, Harvey)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko OGC Company. By the Clerk. (mm)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko OGC Company identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko OGC Company (Kuchler, Deborah)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Judicial District Court, Lafourche Parish, case number 134-888 D (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-9338920) filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko OGC Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleading-Exhibit A-01, #3 Exhibit A-02, #4 Exhibit A-03, #5 Exhibit A-04, #6 Exhibit A-05, #7 Exhibit A-06, #8 Exhibit A-07, #9 Exhibit A-08, #10 Exhibit A-09, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit A-12, #14 Exhibit A-13, #15 Exhibit A-14, #16 Exhibit A-15, #17 Exhibit A-16, #18 Exhibit A-17, #19 Exhibit A-18, #20 Exhibit A-19, #21 Exhibit A-20, #22 Exhibit A-21, #23 Exhibit A-22, #24 Exhibit A-23, #25 Exhibit A-24, #26 Exhibit A-25, #27 Exhibit B, #28 Exhibit C, #29Exhibits 1-14) Attorney Deborah DeRoche Kuchler added to party Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah DeRoche Kuchler added to party Anadarko OGC Company(pty:dft).(Kuchler, Deborah) Modified text on 6/9/2022 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowie Lumber Associates v. Anadarko OGC Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bowie Lumber Associates
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: E. Blair Schilling
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett, III
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Lance C. McCardle
Represented By: Lindsay E. Reeves
Represented By: Peter Newton Freiberg
Represented By: Rosa E. Acheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bowie Lumbar Associates, L.L.C.
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: E. Blair Schilling
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett, III
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Lance C. McCardle
Represented By: Lindsay E. Reeves
Represented By: Peter Newton Freiberg
Represented By: Rosa E. Acheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko OGC Company
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Alease Scott
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Kristyn Lambert
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Philip Wood
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Skylar B. Rudin
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Alease Scott
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Kristyn Lambert
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Philip Wood
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Skylar B. Rudin
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brammer Engineering Inc
Represented By: Benn Vincent
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Hughes
Represented By: Lauren Jean Rucinski
Represented By: Matthew B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South River Operating, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South River Investments LLC
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South River Partners LLC
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New South River LLC
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: John P Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Represented By: Andy Joseph Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Weeks & Gonzalez, APLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Andy Joseph Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?