Cambre v. Riverlands Home Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Drema Cambre
Defendant: Riverlands Home Group, LLC d/b/a Chateau St. James Rehab and Retirement, Priority Management Group, LLC and Riverlands Home Group, LLC doing business as Chateau St. James Rehab and Retirement
Case Number: 2:2022cv01517
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AND REASONS granting #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. The above-captioned matter is remanded to the Twenty-Third Judicial District Court for the Parish of St. James, State of Louisiana. FURTHER ORDERED that Cambre's request for attorney's fees and costs is denied. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 06/27/2022. (ko) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2022: #1 Remand Letter) (ko).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part #15 MOTION to Continue Submission Date, as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Dismiss as Premature under the Louisiana Medical Malpractice Act. Motion will be submitted on 7/13/2022. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/17/2022.(blg)
June 16, 2022 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (R. Doc. 11) Without Date by Drema Cambre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whelen, Christopher)
June 14, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Drema Cambre re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 06/14/2022. (ko)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 5) by Drema Cambre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Whelen, Christopher)
June 10, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Dismiss as Premature under the Louisiana Medical Malpractice Act by Priority Management Group, LLC, Riverlands Home Group, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit State Court Petition for Damages and Relief Under the Nursing Home Residents' Bill of Rights)(Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Motion to Remand. The Court will not suspend the responsive pleading deadline, but the Court grants an extension of time. The defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than FRIDAY, JUNE 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/6/2022. (lw)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by Priority Management Group, LLC, Riverlands Home Group, LLC re #4 Directive of the Clerk. (Price, Mary) Modified on 6/6/2022 (ko).
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Motion to Remand: Attachment had duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (ko)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Motion to Remand by Priority Management Group, LLC, Riverlands Home Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified on 6/3/2022 (ko).
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Drema Cambre. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Whelen, Christopher)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Priority Management Group, LLC. By Clerk.(ko)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Priority Management Group, LLC, Riverlands Home Group, LLC (Price, Mary) Modified on 5/31/2022 (ko).
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, case number 40840-D (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9376955) filed by Priority Management Group, LLC, Riverlands Home Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Class Action Petition for Damages and Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit Service of Citation for Riverlands, #3 Exhibit Service of Citation for Priority Management, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr added to party Priority Management Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr added to party Riverlands Home Group, LLC (pty:dft).(Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified on 5/31/2022 (ko).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cambre v. Riverlands Home Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drema Cambre
Represented By: Matthew M. Coman
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Jordan Jeansonne
Represented By: Stephen Michael Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverlands Home Group, LLC d/b/a Chateau St. James Rehab and Retirement
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverlands Home Group, LLC doing business as Chateau St. James Rehab and Retirement
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?