Cole v. St. Joseph of Harahan, L.L.C., et al
Plaintiff: Ansanta P. Cole, Osborne Picou, Jr. and Ansanta Cole
Defendant: St. Joseph of Harahan, L.L.C., Highpoint Healthcare, L.L.C., St. Joseph of Harahan, LLC, Highpoint Healthcare LLC and Plantation Management Co., L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01540
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AND REASONS granting #6 Motion to Remand. For the reasons stated herein, this case is REMANDED to the Twenty-Fourth Judicial District Court for the Parish of Jefferson. The Court further DENIES plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/12/2022. (mm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2022: #1 Remand Letter) (mm).
June 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Ansanta Cole re #6 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cambre Order and Reasons, #2 Exhibit Broden Order and Reasons)(Whelen, Christopher)
June 15, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Ansanta Cole re #6 MOTION to Remand. (mm)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/15/2022. (mm)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 6 by Ansanta Cole. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Whelen, Christopher)
June 7, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #6 MOTION to Remand. (Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/6/2022. (mm)
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Motion to Remand. **Attachment had duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by Highpoint Healthcare LLC, Plantation Management Co., L.L.C., St. Joseph of Harahan, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Price, Mary) Modified text/linkage on 6/6/2022 (mm).
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Motion to Remand at rec. doc. 6 by Highpoint Healthcare LLC, Plantation Management Company, LLC, St. Joseph of Harahan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified text on 6/6/2022 (mm).
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Ansanta Cole. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Whelen, Christopher)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not select Plantation Management Company, L.L.C. as a filer(s). Clerk added filer(s).** (mm)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Highpoint Healthcare, L.L.C., St. Joseph of Harahan, L.L.C., Plantation Management Company, L.L.C. By the Clerk. (mm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Highpoint Healthcare, L.L.C., St. Joseph of Harahan, L.L.C., Plantation Management, LLC. (Price, Mary) Modified filers on 5/31/2022 (mm).
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 827-574 I (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9377947) filed by Highpoint Healthcare, L.L.C., St. Joseph of Harahan, L.L.C., Plantation Managment Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit Service of Citation Plantation Management Company, LLC, #3 Exhibit Service of Citation Highpoint Healthcare, LLC, #4 Exhibit Service of Citation St. Joseph of Harahan, LLC, #5 Exhibit Defendants Motion for Extension of Time 24th JDC, #6 Civil Cover Sheet With List of Related Cases) Attorney Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr added to party Highpoint Healthcare, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr added to party St. Joseph of Harahan, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified text on 5/31/2022 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. St. Joseph of Harahan, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ansanta P. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osborne Picou, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ansanta Cole
Represented By: Matthew M. Coman
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Jordan Jeansonne
Represented By: Stephen Michael Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph of Harahan, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highpoint Healthcare, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph of Harahan, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Brett Michael Dupuy
Represented By: Jean-Paul J. Morrell
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highpoint Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Brett Michael Dupuy
Represented By: Jean-Paul J. Morrell
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plantation Management Co., L.L.C.
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Brett Michael Dupuy
Represented By: Jean-Paul J. Morrell
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?