Broden v. Riverlands Home Group, L.L.C., et al
Defendant: Riverlands Home Group, L.L.C., d/b/a Chateau St. James Rehab & Retirement, Priority Management Group, L.L.C., Priority Management Group, LLC and Riverlands Home Group, LLC doing business as Chateau St. James Rehab and Retirement
Not Classified By Court: Sandtrell Broden
Case Number: 2:2022cv01573
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
3 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND REASONS granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. The above-captioned matter is remanded to the Twenty-Third Judicial District Court for the Parish of St. James, State of Louisiana. FURTHER ORDERED that Broden's request for attorney's fees and costs is denied. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 06/27/2022. (ko) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2022: #1 Remand Letter) (ko).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Continue Submission Date, as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Dismiss as Premature under the Louisiana Medical Malpractice Act. Motion will be submitted on 7/13/2022. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/17/2022.(blg)
June 16, 2022 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (R. Doc. 10) Without Date by Sandtrell Broden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whelen, Christopher)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Sandtrell Broden re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 06/14/2022. (ko)
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 4) by Sandtrell Broden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Whelen, Christopher)
June 10, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Dismiss as Premature under the Louisiana Medical Malpractice Act by Priority Management Group, LLC, Riverlands Home Group, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit State Court Petition for Damages and Relief Under the Nursing Home Residents' Bill of Rights, #3 Notice of Submission)(Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the submission date with respect to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court is expedited to 6/15/2022. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 06/09/2022.(ko)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion to Suspend the Responsive Pleading Deadline. The Court will not suspend the responsive pleadings deadline, but the Court grants an extension of time. The defendants shall file a responsive pleading no late than 06/10/2022. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 06/08/2022. (ko)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Judge Wendy B Vitter, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/7/2022.(cwa)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Motion to Remand by Priority Management Group, LLC, Riverlands Home Group, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sandtrell Broden. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Whelen, Christopher) Responses due by 6/20/2022 (mmv).
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Priority Management Group, L.L.C., Riverlands Home Group, L.L.C., d/b/a Chateau St. James Rehab & Retirement (Price, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, case number 40841-C (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9380037) filed by Priority Management Group, L.L.C., Riverlands Home Group, L.L.C., d/b/a Chateau St. James Rehab & Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Class Action Petition, #2 Exhibit B Citation of Service Riverlands, #3 Exhibit Citation of Service Priority Management, #4 Civil Cover Sheet )Attorney Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr added to party Priority Management Group, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr added to party Riverlands Home Group, L.L.C., d/b/a Chateau St. James Rehab & Retirement (pty:dft).(Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified text on 6/1/2022 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broden v. Riverlands Home Group, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sandtrell Broden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverlands Home Group, L.L.C., d/b/a Chateau St. James Rehab & Retirement
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Management Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverlands Home Group, LLC doing business as Chateau St. James Rehab and Retirement
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?