Stone v. Carey, et al
Plaintiff: Andy Stone
Defendant: Mariah Carey, Sony Music Entertainment, Walter Afanasieff and Sony Corporation of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv01616
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to All by Andy Stone. (Schmidt, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2022: #1 AO Form) (mmv).
October 20, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 11/7/2022 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the dial-in instructions provided in this notice.(mmv)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Amended Complaint. Defendants, Mariah Carey, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Corporation of America, and Walter Afanasieff, shall have an additional 21 days, or until November 15, 2022, to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/18/22. (fmm)
October 17, 2022 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by Walter Afanasieff, Mariah Carey, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Music Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Samuel, Lindsay)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Amended Complaint. Pursuant to L.R. 7.8, defendants, Mariah Carey, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Corporation of America, and Walter Afanasieff, shall have an additional 21 days, or until October 25, 2022, to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/3/22. (fmm)
September 30, 2022 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by Walter Afanasieff, Mariah Carey, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Music Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Lindsay Marie Samuel added to party Mariah Carey(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay Marie Samuel added to party Sony Corporation of America(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay Marie Samuel added to party Sony Music Entertainment(pty:dft).(Samuel, Lindsay)
August 26, 2022 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 , #8 , and #9 Waiver of Service Executed. Attorney failed to enter waiver date when prompted. Clerk took corrective action. Walter Afanasieff answer due 10/4/2022; Mariah Carey answer due 10/4/2022; Sony Corporation of America answer due 10/4/2022; Sony Music Entertainment answer due 10/4/2022. No further action necessary. (js)
August 25, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed 8/5/2022; Walter Afanasieff answer due 10/4/2022. (Schmidt, Douglas) Modified text on 8/26/2022 (js).
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed 8/5/2022; Sony Corporation of America answer due 10/4/2022; Sony Music Entertainment answer due 10/4/2022. (Schmidt, Douglas) Modified text on 8/26/2022 (js).
August 25, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed 8/5/2022; Mariah Carey answer due 10/4/2022.(Schmidt, Douglas) Modified text on 8/26/2022 (js).
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Andy Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Schmidt, Douglas)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #4 Amended and Supplemental Complaint be STRICKEN from the record as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, Andy Stone, shall have five (5) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended complaint as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/24/2022.(cwa)
June 23, 2022 Filing 4 **STRICKEN PER ORDER AT R. DOC. 5** First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walter Afanasieff, Mariah Carey, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Music Entertainment filed by Andy Stone.(Schmidt, Douglas) Modified on 6/24/2022 (cwa).
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Schmidt, Douglas)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ALAEDC-9385646) filed by Andy Stone.Attorney Douglas M. Schmidt added to party Andy Stone(pty:pla).(Schmidt, Douglas) **WITHHOLD SERVICE** Modified text on 6/6/2022 (cwa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2022: #1 AOForm 121) (cwa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Carey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Stone
Represented By: Douglas M. Schmidt
Represented By: Andrew Colin Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariah Carey
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Afanasieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?