Goffner v. Avondale Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wilson Goffner, Sr.
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Anco Insulaitons, Inc., Arrowood Indemnity Company, CBS Corporation, Eagle, Inc., Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell Corporaton, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Lamorak Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Albert L. Bossier, Jr., John David Roberts, Continental Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Trinity Industries, Inc., Avondale Industries, Inc., Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., Viacom Inc, Goulds Pumps LLC, Grinnell Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Inc, OneBeacon Insurance Company, Commerical Union Insurance Company, Eagle Packing & Equipment Co., Albert L Bossier, Jr, J D Roberts and Paramount Global
Cross Defendant: International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, McCarty Corporation, Travelers Indemnity Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Employers Mutual Liability Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Eagle Inc., Royal Indemnity Company, Westinghouse Electric Company, Eagle Asbestos & Packing Co., Inc., Anco Insulations Inc, Grinnell LLC, General Electric Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Uniroyal Inc, Foster Wheeler LLC, Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger with CBS Corporation, Gould Pumps LLC and Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv03047
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2022 re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. After having considered the record, the written and oral submissions and arguments of counsel, and the applicable law, the Court DENIED the Motion for Leave for reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (caa)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Goulds Pumps LLC by Wilson Goffner, Sr., and Goulds Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Semlinger, Lauren) Modified text on 10/27/2022 (pp).
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Remand by Wilson Goffner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Remand)(Naman, Barrett)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #48 Motion for Leave. IT IS ORDERED that Huntington Ingalls Incorporated is given leave to add Exhibit "E" to its Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/24/2022. (pp)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #48 MOTION for Leave to File or Supplement Record to Correct/Add Exhibit E: Filing attorney did not select category "Proposed Pleading" when attaching document for which leave to file is being requested. Clerk took corrective action. (ko)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File or Supplement Record to Correct/Add Exhibit E by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Exhibit E)(Boyd, Erin) Modified text on 10/24/2022 (ko).
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #45 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps LLC (Semlinger, Lauren)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition of filed by re #12 MOTION to Remand Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U-1, #21 Exhibit U-2, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD)(pp) Modified on 10/21/2022 to edit docket text (bwn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2022: #31 Exhibit E) (pp).
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #43 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand in Excess of 25 Pages. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/19/2022. (pp)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Pl's Motion to Remand in excess of 25 Pages by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U (1), #24 Exhibit U (2), #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z, #30 Exhibit AA, #31 Exhibit BB, #32 Exhibit CC, #33 Exhibit DD)(Boyd, Erin) Modified text on 10/19/2022 (pp).
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that all claims asserted by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated against Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company as alleged insurer of Trinity Industries, Inc., Gretna Machine & Iron Works, Inc., George Hebert, Charles Adams, Dooch Pitre, Robert Huff, Perry Poche, George Fagin, Herbert Leblanc, Jean Richoux, and John Galliano, only, are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs,as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/18/2022. (pp)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler LLC (Bowlin, Angela)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Bowlin, Angela)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Paramount Global identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global (Bowlin, Angela)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Zurich American Insurance Company(as successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company, as the insurer of Marquette Insulation, Inc.) identifying Corporate Parent(s)Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Zurich Insurance Company Ltd,Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. (Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 10/17/2022 (pp).
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company as alleged insurer of Trinity Industries, Inc., Gretna Machine & Iron Works, Inc., George Hebert, Charles Adams, Dooch Pitre, Robert Huff, Perry Poche, George Fagin, Herbert LeBlanc, Jean Richoux and John Galliano, by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gillen, Laura)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company(as the Liability Insurers of the following Executive Officers of Avondale industries) identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY CORP., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company (Wilson, Kristopher)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to Cross-Claims by Bayer CropScience, Inc. by Travelers Indemnity Company(as the Liability Insurers of the following Executive Officers of Avondale industries).(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 10/17/2022 (pp).
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Gillen, Laura)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that David W. O'Quinn of the law firm of Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC is enrolled as additional counsel of record for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/13/2022. (pp)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Inc (Penn, Elizabeth)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA for Bayer CropScience, Inc. (St. Julien, Milele)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that the claims of Plaintiff, Wilson Goffner, Sr., against Defendants, Eagle, Inc., Pennsylvania General Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, and First State Insurance Company, are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear their own respective costs, and reserving unto Plaintiff all claims against all other defendants. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/12/2022. (pp)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record David O'Quinn by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Erin) Modified text on 10/13/2022 (pp).
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #12 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE: A party in this matter has requested oral argument on a pending motion. In accordance with Local Rule 78.1, a request for oral argument is deemed granted unless the Court advises the parties otherwise. Accordingly, absent a further Order from this Court denying the request for oral argument, argument will proceed on the motion's specified submission date. Oral arguments before Judge Currault are held in-person in Courtroom B-421 at 11:00 a.m. (cwa)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Travelers Indemnity Company(as the Liability Insurers of the following Executive Officers of Avondale industries).Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Eagle, Inc., Pennsylvania General Insurance Co., Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Co. and First State Insurance Co. by Wilson Goffner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Naman, Barrett)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Request/Statement of Oral Argument regarding #18 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Naman, Barrett) Modified text on 10/11/2022 (pp).
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition of re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Naman, Barrett) Modified text on 10/11/2022 (pp).
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint.** Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge.Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement with Plaintiff by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Burg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 10/11/2022 (pp).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/26/2022. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault.(Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Pleading)(Gillen, Laura) Modified text on 10/7/2022 (pp).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that David W. O'Quinn, of the law firm of Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC, is enrolled as additional counsel of record for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/6/2022. (pp)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record David W. O'Quinn by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 10/6/2022 (pp).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement as to Eagle, Inc., f/k/a Eagle Asbestos & Packing Co., Pennsylvania General Insurance Company as the insurer for Eagle. Inc., Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, as the insurer for Eagle, Inc., and First State Insurance Company, as the insurer for Eagle, Inc. by Wilson Goffner, Sr. (Clark, Matthew) Modified text on 10/5/2022 (pp).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #13 request for oral argument is GRANTED. Argument is set for Monday, November 7, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/4/2022.(pp)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument regarding #12 MOTION to Remand by Wilson Goffner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(pp)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Wilson Goffner, Sr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X)(pp)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits on Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/30/2022. (pp)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limits on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Wilson Goffner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Proposed Pleading Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Proposed Pleading Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #30 Notice of Submission, #31 Proposed Pleading Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #32 Proposed Pleading Memo in Support of Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Naman, Barrett)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Jamie H. Baglio, Douglas R. Elliott, Etienne F. Ren, and the law firm Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker, & Carey, LLC are hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Defendant Anco Insulations, Inc., in the above captioned matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Margaret M. Joffe, Kenan S. Rand, Jr., Shelley L. Thompson, and the law firm of Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC, will remain as counsel of record for Defendant, Anco Insulations, Inc., in the above captioned matter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/21/2022. (pp)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Jamie H. Baglio, Douglas R. Elliott, and Etienne F. Rene as Attorney by Anco Insulations Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Shelley)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Anco Insulations Inc (Joffe, Margaret)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle, Inc. (Redfearn, Douglas)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Part 1, #2 State Court Pleadings Part 2, #3 State Court Pleadings Part 3, #4 State Court Pleadings Part 4, #5 State Court Pleadings Part 5, #6 State Court Pleadings Part 6)(Boyd, Erin)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Ankersen, Brittney)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. (pp)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-01485 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9523834) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Erin Helen Boyd added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Boyd, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goffner v. Avondale Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Goffner, Sr.
Represented By: Ryan Pete Phillips
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Represented By: Barrett Naman
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Jeffrey A. O'Connell
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Kimmier L. Paul
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulaitons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrowood Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel J. Veninata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kimmier L. Paul
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Kimmier L. Paul
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Insurance Company
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerical Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Packing & Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Roberts
Represented By: Ronald Dean Church, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Employers Mutual Liability Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Eagle Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Royal Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Westinghouse Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Eagle Asbestos & Packing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Anco Insulations Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Uniroyal Inc
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger with CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Gould Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?