Whipple v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Jonathan Whipple
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv03132
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Filing 8 Receipt of Transfer Case to the Northern District of Florida (my)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Northern District of Florida. MDL case number is 2885. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(am)
September 23, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2885. (am)
September 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; 3M Company served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Centola, Lawrence) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/15/2022) (am).
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (sa)
September 6, 2022 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to 3M Company filed by Jonathan Whipple re #1 Complaint. (Centola, Lawrence)
September 6, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9536405) filed by Jonathan Whipple. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Lawrence J. Centola, III added to party Jonathan Whipple(pty:pla).(Centola, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whipple v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Whipple
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Berniard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?