Dunn and Sonnier Flowers & Antiques, LLC et al v. Entergy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dunn and Sonnier Flowers & Antiques, LLC and Stephen Ray Sonnier
Defendant: Entergy Corporation, Entergy New Orleans, LLC and Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2022cv03198
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
3 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1452 Removal of Claims in re Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay and administratively close case as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/20/2022. (lag)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/20/2022.(mm) (NEF: Sec. L, MJ 4&5)
September 19, 2022 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Paul, Matthew)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal as to Entergy Corporation, Entergy New Orleans, LLC; answer due 10/18/2022. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/14/2022. (mm)
September 13, 2022 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy Corporation (Paul, Matthew)
September 13, 2022 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Entergy Corporation, Entergy New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Matthew)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy New Orleans, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Corporation for Entergy New Orleans, LLC (Paul, Matthew)
September 9, 2022 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Corporation for Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. (Paul, Matthew)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy New Orleans, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Paul, Matthew)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2022-07976 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9544246) filed by Entergy New Orleans, LLC, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Entergy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Entergy New Orleans, LLC(pty:dft).(Paul, Matthew) Modified text on 9/12/2022 (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn and Sonnier Flowers & Antiques, LLC et al v. Entergy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunn and Sonnier Flowers & Antiques, LLC
Represented By: Frank Charles Dudenhefer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Ray Sonnier
Represented By: Frank Charles Dudenhefer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Eva J. Dossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy New Orleans, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Eva J. Dossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Represented By: Eva J. Dossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?