United States of America v. Housing Authority of New Orleans et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Housing Authority of New Orleans, Columbia Residential, LLC, HRI Properties, LLC, McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc., KBK Enterprises, LLC, Enterprise Community Partners, Inc., Providence Community Housing and L+M Development Partners, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv03568
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Consent Order; ORDERED that the matter is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the order. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/16/2022.(blg)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Jerry Anthony Beatmann, Jr for McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/05/2022. (ko)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/05/2022. (ko)
October 4, 2022 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jerry Anthony Beatmann, Jr added to party McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc.(pty:dft).(Beatmann, Jerry) Modified text on 10/5/2022 (ko).
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Approve and Enter Proposed Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Parties' Fully Executed Consent Order, #2 Appendix A to Consent Order - Defendants' Property Associations, #3 Appendix B to Consent Order - Bienville Basin Retrofit Plan, #4 Appendix C to Consent Order - Columbia Parc Retrofit Plan, #5 Appendix C.1 to Consent Order - Columbia Parc Routes, #6 Appendix D to Consent Order - Faubourg Lafitte Non-Senior Retrofit Plan, #7 Appendix E to Consent Order - Faubourg Lafitte Senior Retrofit Plan, #8 Appendix F to Consent Order - Fischer Senior Retrofit Plan, #9 Appendix G to Consent Order - Guste Retrofit Plan, #10 Appendix H to Consent Order - Harmony Oaks Retrofit Plan, #11 Appendix H.1 to Consent Order - Harmony Oaks Routes, #12 Appendix I to Consent Order - Marrero Commons Retrofit Plan, #13 Appendix I.1 to Consent Order - Marrero Commons Routes, #14 Appendix J to Consent Order - River Garden I Retrofit Plan, #15 Appendix K to Consent Order - River Garden II Retrofit Plan, #16 Appendix L to Consent Order - Notice to Tenants, #17 Appendix M to Consent Order - Survey Protocol, #18 Appendix N to Consent Order - Property Survey Report Protocol, #19 Appendix O to Consent Order - Notice of Retrofits, #20 Appendix P to Consent Order - Notice to Potential Victims, #21 Appendix Q to Consent Order - List of Organizations, #22 Appendix R to Consent Order - Release, #23 Appendix S to Consent Order - Acknowledgement of Receipt, #24 Appendix T to Consent Order - Certification of Training)(Bryant, Aurora) Modified on 10/3/2022 (ko).
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Aurora Rose Bryant added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Bryant, Aurora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Housing Authority of New Orleans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Aurora Rose Bryant
Represented By: Sandra Ema Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Residential, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRI Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry Anthony Beatmann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBK Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Community Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Community Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L+M Development Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?