Fanguy v. Safepoint Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joshua Fanguy
Defendant: Safepoint Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2022cv04404
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 12/20/22 Order, #2 Case List)(lag)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Safepoint Insurance Company.(Foote, Jason)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(js)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. List of Parties should be filed as a separate docket entry instead of an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action by separating this attachment and docketing it as a separate entry. (js)
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance: List of Parties by Safepoint Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (js)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Safepoint Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Safepoint Holdings, Inc. for Safepoint Insurance Company (Foote, Jason)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Safepoint Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Foote, Jason)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Foote, Jason)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd Judicial District Court, Terrebonne Parish, case number 194381, A (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9644705) filed by Safepoint Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit Details of Safepoint Insurance Company, #3 Exhibit Letter and Stipulation, #4 List of Attorneys and Parties, #5 Certificate of Filing of State Court Record)Attorney Jason Paul Foote added to party Safepoint Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Foote, Jason) Modified text on 11/7/2022 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fanguy v. Safepoint Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Fanguy
Represented By: Cassie Preston Gailmor
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Represented By: Jeanne K. Demarest
Represented By: Jennifer Kuechmann
Represented By: John Bartholomew Kelly, III
Represented By: Kurt A. Offner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safepoint Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Paul Foote
Represented By: Kaleigh K. Rooney
Represented By: James D. Caboni-Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?