Melara v. Safepoint Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cesar Melara
Defendant: Safepoint Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2022cv04405
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Safepoint Insurance Company.(Foote, Jason)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. List of Parties and Counsel should be filed as a separate docket entry instead of an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Also the Certification of State Court Record should be filed as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the attachments and docketing as a separate entries. (cs)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance, Certificate of Filing of State Court Record by Safepoint Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (cs)
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance, List of Attorneys and Parties by Safepoint Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (cs)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(cs)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Safepoint Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Safepoint Holdings, Inc. for Safepoint Insurance Company (Foote, Jason)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance by Safepoint Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Foote, Jason)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish case number 832-931 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9644786) filed by Safepoint Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Damages, #2 Details of Safepoint Insurance Company, #3 Policy, #4 Letter and Stipulation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 List of Attorneys and Parties, #7 Certificate of Filing State Court Record)Attorney Jason Paul Foote added to party Safepoint Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Foote, Jason) Modified text on 11/7/2022 (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melara v. Safepoint Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Melara
Represented By: George Richard Ketry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safepoint Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Paul Foote
Represented By: James D. Caboni-Quinn
Represented By: Kaleigh K. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?