In the Matter of the Complaint of JLH Enterprises, LLC
Petitioner: JLH Enterprises, LLC
Claimant: Salvatore Cerise, Marla Cerise, Willard Sapia, Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C., Jean Lafitte Marine LLC, Maria Couevas, Shaw Couevas and Bernie Couevas, Jr
Case Number: 2:2022cv04674
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30504 Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 13 CLAIM in Limitation by Jean Lafitte Harbor LLC, Jean Lafitte Marine LLC, Maria Couevas, Bernie Couevas, Shaw Couevas. Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party Jean Lafitte Harbor LLC(pty:clm), Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party Jean Lafitte Marine LLC(pty:clm), Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party Maria Couevas(pty:clm), Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party Bernie Couevas(pty:clm), Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party Shaw Couevas(pty:clm).(McDonald, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 12/20/22 Order, #2 Case List)(lag)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Approval of Affidavit of Value and Order directing Issuance of Notice and Enjoining Claims. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/01/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Deposit into the Registry of the Court the Amount of $250.00 in Lieu of Filing a Cost Bond. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/01/2022. (NEF: Financial) (ko)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice to Claimants: Document 4 was incorrectly filed as a separate document, instead of as an attachment to Document 3 Motion for Approval of Affidavit of Value and Order Directing Issuance of Notice and Enjoining Claims. Clerk took corrective action by attaching the Proposed Notice to the Motion. No further action is needed. (ko)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint: Filing attorney did not properly format PDF of Civil Cover Sheet. When the document was opened, the PDF was able to be edited. When using a form, click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the documents to PDF format. Clerk took corrective action by replacing image with one that cannot be edited. (ko)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by JLH Enterprises, LLC of Deposits of Security for Costs and for Value of Vessel. (McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/30/2022 (ko).
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by JLH Enterprises, LLC of Collateral Proceedings. (McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/30/2022 (ko).
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR--SEE DOC 3** NOTICE by JLH Enterprises, LLC to Claimants. (McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/30/2022 (ko).
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Approval of Affidavit of Value and Order directing Issuance of Notice and Enjoining Claims by JLH Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonald, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2022: #2 Proposed Pleading Notice to Claimants) (ko). Modified text on 11/30/2022 (ko).
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Deposit Costs in Lieu of Bond by JLH Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/30/2022 (ko).
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9674906) filed by JLH Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit First Written Notice, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Value, #5 Affidavit Verification of Complaint, #6 Affidavit of Pending Freight)Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party JLH Enterprises, LLC(pty:pet).(McDonald, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2022) (ko). Modified text/filer on 11/30/2022 (ko).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of JLH Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JLH Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr.
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Represented By: Brad D. Ferrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Salvatore Cerise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marla Cerise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Willard Sapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C.
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Represented By: Brad D. Ferrand
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jean Lafitte Marine LLC
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Represented By: Brad D. Ferrand
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maria Couevas
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Represented By: Brad D. Ferrand
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shaw Couevas
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Represented By: Brad D. Ferrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bernie Couevas, Jr
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr.
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Represented By: Brad D. Ferrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?