Gorham v. Kaufman
Plaintiff: Northwest Pacific Property Management, LLC
Defendant: Michelle Kaufman, Claudia Mathis and Expedia Financial Consultants, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Patrick Gorham
Garnishee: Gulf Coast Bank & Trust Company
Case Number: 2:2022mc00008
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Garnishment Interrogatories by Gulf Coast Bank & Trust Company.(cg)
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service by Patrick Gorham, Northwest Pacific Property Management, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Amond, Kristen) Modified text on 1/19/2022 (cg).
January 16, 2022 Filing 12 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Amond, Kristen) Modified on 1/18/2022 (cg).
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 WRIT of Execution and Fieri Facias issued. (cg)(3cc:USM)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 GARNISHMENT INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Gulf Coast Bank and Trust Company by Patrick Gorham, Northwest Pacific Property Management, LLC. (cg)(3cc:USM)
January 13, 2022 Filing 9 Citation Issued as to Gulf Coast Bank and Trust (cg)(3cc:USM)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Writ of Garnishment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gulf Coast Bank and Trust Company be cited as garnishee, and ordered to answer, under oath and in writing, the attached interrogatories, as provided by law. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/11/22. (cg) (3cc:USM)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alex P Rosenthal. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/10/22. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (cg)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Patrick Gorham, Northwest Pacific Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Writ of Fieri Facias, #3 Citation, #4 Interrogatories)(Amond, Kristen)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9172975) by Patrick Gorham, Northwest Pacific Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Rosenthal Declaration, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Amond, Kristen)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9167387) by Patrick Gorham, Northwest Pacific Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Rosenthal Declaration, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)Attorney Kristen Diane Amond added to party Northwest Pacific Property Management, LLC(pty:pla).(Amond, Kristen) Modified on 1/5/2022 (cg).
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Amond, Kristen)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment from District of Southern District of Florida (Filing fee $ 49 receipt number ALAEDC-9165385) filed by Patrick Gorham. (Attachments: #1 Statement Letter to Clerk)Attorney Kristen Diane Amond added to party Patrick Gorham(pty:rppla).(Amond, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorham v. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Patrick Gorham
Represented By: Kristen Diane Amond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Financial Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Pacific Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Kristen Diane Amond
Represented By: Alex P Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Gulf Coast Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?