Stroupe v. Borchert
Plaintiff: Paul M Stroupe
Defendant: Laura M Borchert, Robin L Rice, Edmund J Rice, II and Aaron C Stroupe
Case Number: 2:2023cv00265
Filed: January 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
2 Judge: Sarah S Vance
3 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby transferred to Section "R" (1) for further proceedings. Case transferred to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Wendy B Vitter, Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/3/2023.(mmv)
February 27, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Edmund J Rice, II, Robin L Rice, Aaron C Stroupe, Laura M Borchert. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2023: #3 Summons) (lb). Modified on 2/27/2023 (lb).
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/23/2024. (lb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2023: #1 Pauper Letter) (lb).
February 15, 2023 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul M Stroupe. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (aj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2023: #1 Original Deficient Filing) (aj).
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Laura M Borchert filed by Paul M Stroupe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2023: #2 Original Deficient Filing, #3 Original Deficient Civil Cover Sheet) (aj).
January 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Deficient Filing) (aj)
January 18, 2023 Filing 2 ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul M Stroupe. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
January 18, 2023 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** COMPLAINT with jury demand against Laura M Borchert filed by Paul M Stroupe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroupe v. Borchert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M Stroupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura M Borchert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin L Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund J Rice, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron C Stroupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?