Tyler v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Maurice L. Tyler
Defendant: Jason Rogers Williams, Chief Justice Weimer, Inga Petrovich, Karen K. Herman, Charles Plattsmeir, Daniel Engelberg, Douglas Williams, District Attorney for New Orleans, Disciplinary Counsel of the Louisiana State Bar Association, Charles Plattsmier, Robert Jenkins and Brad Scott
Case Number: 2:2023cv01105
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12117 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Maurice L. Tyler. (aj) Images QC'd on 5/9/2023 (ss).
April 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(cg)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE and granting #2 Motion for Leave to to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to withhold summons until the Court finds that Plaintiff has satisfied the following rule to show cause. For the reasons herein, Plaintiff Maurice Lemuel Tyler is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING by Friday, May 26, 2023 as to why all Defendants should not be summarily dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i-iii) on grounds of either absolute or qualified immunity or failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 4/24/23. (cg)
April 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Maurice L. Tyler. (aj) Images QC'd on 4/28/2023 (ss).
March 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Maurice L. Tyler. (ss) Image QC'd on 4/3/2023 (aj).
March 30, 2023 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maurice L. Tyler. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (aj) QC'd Image on 4/18/2023 (ss).
March 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Maurice L. Tyler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons :Charles Plattsmeir, #3 Summons :Chief Justice Weiner, #4 Summons :Daniel Engelberg, #5 Summons :Douglas Williams, #6 Summons :Inga Petrovich, #7 Summons :Karen K. Herman, #8 Summons :Office of Disciplinary Counsel, #9 Summons :Office of District of Attorney, #10 Summons :Robert Jenkins, #11 Summons :Jason Regers Williams)(aj) QC'd Image on 4/18/2023 (ss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice L. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rogers Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Justice Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inga Petrovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen K. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Plattsmeir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Engelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney for New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disciplinary Counsel of the Louisiana State Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Plattsmier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?