Dillion v. Martin, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Dillion
Defendant: Jimmie Martin, Jr., Argie Mark, Jr., National Fire & Marine Insurance Company and Jimmie, Jr. Martin
Case Number: 2:2023cv01727
Filed: May 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Barry Bolton is sanctioned $270.00, payable to the United States District Court, Eastern District of Louisiana, Clerks Office located at 500 Poydras St. C-151, New Orleans, LA 70130. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Attorney Barry Bolton (La. Bar No. 24026) is hereby WITHDRAWN from the above-captioned matter. Mr. Bolton may re-enroll in the above-captioned matter only upon compliance with this Court's orders and any other requirements imposed by the Court of Clerk. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to plaintiff Gerald Dillion, located at 810 Redwood Ave, Bogalusa, LA 70427. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than Thursday, August 31, 2023 at 5:00 P.M., plaintiff Gerald Dillion shall either enroll new counsel to represent him or file written notice by the latter date that he intends to proceed pro se without counsel in this action. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/2/2023. (dw) (cc: Plaintiff)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying #9 Motion to Compel and Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/20/2023. (lb)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that no later than Monday, July 17, 2023, counsel for plaintiff, Barry W. Bolton (La. Bar No. 24026), shall show-cause in writing, not to exceed five (5) pages in length, why he should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with Court's five notices. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 07/06/2023.(js)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 First MOTION to Compel and Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted. Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (js)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First MOTION to Compel and Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel Dated March 16, 2023, #3 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel Dated April 20, 2023, #4 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel Dated April 27, 2023, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Rule 37 Certificate)(Barnett, Devin) Modified text on 6/27/2023 (js).
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that Devin J. Barnett of Deutsch Kerrigan, LLP is hereby ENROLLED as additional counsel of record on behalf of defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/26/2023. (pp)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Devin J. Barnett by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Sloan)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault.(cwa)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (kls)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent(s)Berkshire Hathaway Inc. (Champagne, Megan) Modified text on 5/24/2023 (pp).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Compliance : List of Parties and Pleadings by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Champagne, Megan)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Champagne, Megan)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC - Washington, case number 117618 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9948457) filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record)Attorney Megan D. Champagne added to party National Fire & Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Champagne, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillion v. Martin, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Dillion
Represented By: Barry W. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argie Mark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan D. Champagne
Represented By: Maxwell C Hadley
Represented By: Sloan L. Abernathy
Represented By: Devin J. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie, Jr. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?