Brignac v. Anco Insulations, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Percy Brignac
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Idex Corporation, International Paper Company, OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Paramount Global doing business as ViacomCBS Inc formerly known as CBS Corporation formerly known as Vicom Inc formerly known as Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Northrop Gruman Shipbuilding, Inc., Anco Insulations, Inc., Amchem Products, Inc., Benjamin Foster Co, Charles Johnson, Crane Co., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc., Grefco, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Viking Pump Inc, Champion International Corp., U.S. Plywood Corporation, John Crane, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Maryland Casualty Company, McDermott Investments, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Commercial Union Insurance Company, CBS Corporation, Vicom Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Travelers Indemnity Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Redco Corporation, Zurich American Insurance Company, McDermott Incorporated and Foster Wheeler LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Insurance Company of North America and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Cross Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Paramount Global and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv03124
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2023 Filing 69 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 Third Party Complaint by Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) Attorney Ashlee Cassman Grant added to party Insurance Company of North America(pty:3pd).(Grant, Ashlee)
October 2, 2023 Filing 68 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #66 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Complaint. 1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney uploaded the motion and proposed order on legal size paper. Local Rule 10.1E: All documents filed in this court must be on 8.5in x 11in paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action is needed. (rt)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING #65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant, International Paper Company. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/29/2023. (jls)
September 29, 2023 Filing 66 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Percy Brignac. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott) (Main Document 66 replaced on 10/2/2023) (rt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/2/2023) (rt). Modified text/referal on 10/2/2023 (rt).
September 29, 2023 Filing 65 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Mary R. Arthur as Attorney by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Thomas) Modified text on 10/2/2023 (rt).
September 26, 2023 Filing 64 ANSWER to #33 Third Party Complaint by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Penn, Elizabeth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 63 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Penn, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2023 Filing 62 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by John Crane, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group, plc for John Crane, Inc. (Corb, Natasha)
September 21, 2023 Filing 61 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim, with Jury Demand by John Crane, Inc. (Corb, Natasha)
September 21, 2023 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by John Crane, Inc. Attorney Natasha Amber Corb added to party John Crane, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Natasha Amber Corb added to party John Crane, Inc.(pty:crd).(Corb, Natasha) Modified on 9/21/2023 (mmm).
September 21, 2023 Filing 59 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim, of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Paramount Global. Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party Paramount Global(pty:crd).(Long, Kelly)
September 21, 2023 Filing 58 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim, of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Long, Kelly)
September 21, 2023 Filing 57 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim, of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company.Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party General Electric Company(pty:crd).(Long, Kelly)
September 20, 2023 Filing 56 ANSWER to #33 Cross-Claim & 3rd Party Complaint with Jury Demand by Redco Corporation.(Romero, Jacqueline)
September 20, 2023 Filing 55 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim by McDermott Incorporated.(Lowenthal, Joseph)
September 19, 2023 Filing 54 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim, by Warren Pumps, LLC. Attorney Thomas A. Porteous added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:crd).(Porteous, Thomas)
September 19, 2023 Filing 53 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim, by Goulds Pumps LLC.(Semlinger, Lauren)
September 18, 2023 Filing 52 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim by Grefco, Inc. Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party Grefco, Inc.(pty:crd).(Matherne, James) Modified text on 9/19/2023 (js).
September 18, 2023 Filing 51 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim by Viking Pump Inc. Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party IDEX Corporation(pty:crd).(Matherne, James) Modified text/filer on 9/19/2023 (js).
September 18, 2023 Filing 50 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim with Jury Demand by International Paper Company.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:crd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/19/2023 (my).
September 15, 2023 Filing 49 ANSWER to #48 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Wilson, Kristopher)
September 15, 2023 Filing 48 DEFICIENT: ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Anco Insulations, Inc. by Anco Insulations, Inc..Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Anco Insulations, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified on 9/18/2023 (mmm).
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company dismissed. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/15/2023. (my)
September 14, 2023 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust. (mmm)
September 14, 2023 Filing 45 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Without Prejudice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Percy Brignac. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay)
September 14, 2023 Filing 44 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. re #43 Answer to Crossclaim,,,. (Ankersen, Brittney)
September 14, 2023 Filing 43 ANSWER to #33 Crossclaim; CROSSCLAIM against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:crd).(Ankersen, Brittney)
August 31, 2023 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 31, 2023 Filing 41 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 29, 2023 Filing 40 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company (Wilson, Kristopher)
August 29, 2023 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text/link on 8/30/2023 (lb).
August 29, 2023 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Insurance Company of North America, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(mmm)
August 29, 2023 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to Anco Insulations, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Crane Co., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Grefco, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IDEX Corporation, International Paper Company, John Crane, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, McDermott Investments, LLC, Paramount Global, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(mmm)
August 28, 2023 Filing 36 Request of Summons Issued as to Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Insurance Company of North America, The Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal Holding, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #33 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Gillen, Laura)
August 28, 2023 Filing 35 Request of Summons Issued as to Anco Insulations, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Crane Co., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Grefco, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IDEX Corporation, International Paper Company, John Crane, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company as insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Co., McDermott Investments, LLC, Paramount Global, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company as successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #33 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(Gillen, Laura)
August 28, 2023 Filing 34 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Gillen, Laura)
August 28, 2023 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Insurance Company of North America, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Anco Insulations, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Crane Co., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Grefco, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IDEX Corporation, International Paper Company, John Crane, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, McDermott Investments, LLC, Paramount Global, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Gillen, Laura)
August 25, 2023 Filing 32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC Scotland for Foster Wheeler LLC (Long, Kelly)
August 25, 2023 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Long, Kelly)
August 22, 2023 Filing 30 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by FMC Corporation (Bowlin, Angela)
August 22, 2023 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Original Petition for Damages by FMC Corporation.Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela)
August 22, 2023 Filing 28 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Redco Corp. fka Crane Co. identifying Corporate Parent Redco Corporation for Crane Co. (Romero, Jacqueline)
August 22, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Crane Co..Attorney Jacqueline Romero added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft).(Romero, Jacqueline)
August 21, 2023 Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McDermott Inc. Corporate Parent: J. Ray McDermott Holdings, LLC. (Lowenthal, Joseph) Modified text on 8/22/2023 (mmm).
August 21, 2023 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Long, Kelly)
August 21, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by General Electric Company.(Long, Kelly)
August 17, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Compliance with Court's Directive by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings)(Boyd, Erin)
August 15, 2023 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. Document contains incorrect Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section A and Magistrate Judge (2). (mmm)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 08/14/2023. (cs)
August 14, 2023 Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney)
August 14, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney)
August 14, 2023 Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Paramount Global identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global (Long, Kelly)
August 14, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Paramount Global.Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party Paramount Global(pty:dft).(Long, Kelly)
August 11, 2023 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher)
August 10, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Idex Corporation.Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party Idex Corporation(pty:dft).(Matherne, James)
August 10, 2023 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA for Bayer CropScience, Inc. (St. Julien, Milele)
August 10, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Bayer CropScience, Inc..Attorney Milele N. St. Julien added to party Bayer CropScience, Inc.(pty:dft).(St. Julien, Milele)
August 10, 2023 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Zurich American Insurance Company as successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich Holding Company of America Inc (Devenport, Marc)
August 10, 2023 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Trolinger, Cole)
August 10, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Goulds Pumps LLC. Attorney Cole Christian Trolinger added to party Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc.(pty:dft).(Trolinger, Cole) Modified text/party/filer on 8/11/2023 (mmm).
August 9, 2023 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by International Paper Company.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth)
August 8, 2023 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #4 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section A, Judge Jay Zainey and Magistrate (2) Donna Currault. (mmm)
August 8, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Grefco, Inc..Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party Grefco, Inc.(pty:dft).(Matherne, James)
August 8, 2023 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay)
August 8, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay)
August 4, 2023 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (mmm)
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-4931 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10065700) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Erin Helen Boyd added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Boyd, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brignac v. Anco Insulations, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Kimmier L. Paul
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Lesley Chanel Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global doing business as ViacomCBS Inc formerly known as CBS Corporation formerly known as Vicom Inc formerly known as Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Gruman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Kimmier L. Paul
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Lesley Chanel Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Foster Co
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Lesley Chanel Muse
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grefco, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion International Corp.
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Plywood Corporation
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra D. Bourbon
Represented By: Bradley A. Hays
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Danielle M.S. Riera
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Mary Reed
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott Investments, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr.
Represented By: Madeleine Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicom Inc
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Darren Albert Patin
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott Incorporated
Represented By: Madeleine Fischer
Represented By: Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Brignac
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Scott M Galante
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Ashlee Cassman Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?