Ricks v. Louisiana State
Plaintiff: Wesley Ricks
Defendant: Louisiana State
Case Number: 2:2023cv05021
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Wesley Ricks SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before November 3, 2023, why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to prosecute by his failure to return a competed 1983 complaint form and failure to either pay the filing fee or submit a certified pauper application. Payment of the filing fee or submission of a properly completed 1983 complaint form and a completed and certified pauper application by this deadline will satisfy the Court's Order. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER WILL RESULT IN A RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/2/2023.(lb)
August 31, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit) (aj)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT***COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Wesley Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?