Lemieux v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nelson R. Lemieux
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2023cv05240
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl J Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 11 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 10, 2023 Filing 10 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 3, 2023 Filing 9 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Allied Trust Insurance Company.(Matthias, Kyle)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(cg)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Allied Trust Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (Matthias, Kyle)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC for Allied Trust Insurance Company (Matthias, Kyle)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance List of All Parties and Pleadings by Allied Trust Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Matthias, Kyle)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl J Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (kls)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from CDC, Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-08073 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10147904) filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit Verification)Attorney Kyle Clinton Matthias added to party Allied Trust Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Matthias, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemieux v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson R. Lemieux
Represented By: Mark G. Montiel, Jr.
Represented By: Jack Frank Griffin
Represented By: Landis Rebekah Silva
Represented By: Lawson Nguyen
Represented By: Shelby S Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle Clinton Matthias
Represented By: John Covington Henry
Represented By: Lauren Alexis Lam
Represented By: Matthew D. Monson
Represented By: Austin Tyler Welch, I
Represented By: Erin W. Berggren
Represented By: John D. Mineo, IV
Represented By: Rowan Whitehurst Stoehr
Represented By: Nathan Ryne Hand
Represented By: Rachel L. Flarity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?