Pitre et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gavin Pitre and Chelsea Pitre
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2023cv05246
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Darrel James Papillion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 3, 2023 Filing 8 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
September 23, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Allied Trust Insurance Company.(Klotz, Donald)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(my)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (kls)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC (Klotz, Donald) Modified on 9/20/2023 (my).
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by Allied Trust Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of 1447(b) Filing. (Klotz, Donald) Modified on 9/20/2023 (my).
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 29th JDC, case number 92610 D (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10148159) filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Donald Robert Klotz, Jr added to party Allied Trust Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Klotz, Donald) Modified on 9/20/2023 (my).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitre et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin Pitre
Represented By: Ryan P. Collins
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Guidry
Represented By: Brandon Scott Andrews
Represented By: Charles Scott Courrege
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Guidry, Jr
Represented By: Ray A. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Pitre
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Guidry
Represented By: Brandon Scott Andrews
Represented By: Charles Scott Courrege
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Guidry, Jr
Represented By: Ray A. Collins
Represented By: Ryan P. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald Robert Klotz, Jr.
Represented By: Alan J. Yacoubian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?