Ambrose et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kahealani F Ambrose and Christopher Ambrose
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2023cv05286
Filed: September 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND REASONS denying #9 Motion to Remove Case from Hurricane Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/1/2023. (rt)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Remove Case from Hurricane Case Management Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appraisal Letter, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Appraiser Position, #3 Exhibit Defendant Appraiser Position, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff Foreclosure Docs, #5 Exhibit Defendant Prior Claim Estimate, #6 Exhibit Defendant Prior Claim Letter)(Melancon, Devlan)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION to Remove Case from Hurricane Case Management Order : Filing attorney should have changed "N" to "Y" at the question "Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?" This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action. (ko)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remove Case from Hurricane Case Management Order by Allied Trust Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B letter, #3 Errata Exhibit C - email, #4 Notice of Submission)(Klotz, Donald) Modified on 10/10/2023 (ko).
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
September 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Allied Trust Insurance Company.(Klotz, Donald)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(lb)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied Trust Insurance Company (Klotz, Donald)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Allied Trust Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of 1447(b) Filing. (Klotz, Donald) Modified text on 9/20/2023 (lb).
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st JDC, case number 20230002669 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10150878) filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Donald Robert Klotz, Jr added to party Allied Trust Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Klotz, Donald) Modified text on 9/20/2023 (lb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrose et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kahealani F Ambrose
Represented By: Devlan Wesley Melancon, Sr.
Represented By: Aaron Lee Godbey
Represented By: Dante Joseph Cortello
Represented By: Michael S. Giardina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ambrose
Represented By: Devlan Wesley Melancon, Sr.
Represented By: Aaron Lee Godbey
Represented By: Dante Joseph Cortello
Represented By: Michael S. Giardina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald Robert Klotz, Jr.
Represented By: Alan J. Yacoubian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?