Shaffett et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jason Shaffett and Haley Shaffett
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2023cv05340
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 3, 2023 Filing 8 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
September 21, 2023 Filing 7 HURRICANE IDA CASES Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/12/2023.(mp)
September 21, 2023 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Corporate disclosure statements should be filed as a separate docket entry instead of an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action by separating this attachment and docketing it as a separate entry. (mp)
September 21, 2023 Filing 5 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal.(mp)
September 21, 2023 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC for Allied Trust Insurance Company. (mp)
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st JDC, Livingston Parish, case number 179073 (Fee previously paid) filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Scott, William)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 DUPLICATE FILING - See Rec Doc 2: NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st JDC, Livingston Parish, case number 179073 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10155498) filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Pleadings)Attorney William B. Scott added to party Allied Trust Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Scott, William) Modified on 9/21/2023 (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffett et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Shaffett
Represented By: Kevin R. Sloan
Represented By: Henry John Roth
Represented By: Lewis Scott Joanen
Represented By: Lillie E. Joyce
Represented By: Skye Sturlese Fantaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Shaffett
Represented By: Kevin R. Sloan
Represented By: Henry John Roth
Represented By: Lewis Scott Joanen
Represented By: Lillie E. Joyce
Represented By: Skye Sturlese Fantaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Scott
Represented By: Stephen R. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?