Chisholm et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kyle Chisholm and Linda Chisholm
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2023cv05392
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
October 3, 2023 Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
September 22, 2023 Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CASES Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/12/2023.(lag)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC for Allied Trust Insurance Company (Arceneaux, Jeanne)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance by Allied Trust Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Arceneaux, Jeanne) Modified on 9/22/2023 (lag).
September 20, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (kls)
September 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court Jefferson Parish, case number 843942 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10163212) filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jeanne Arceneaux added to party Allied Trust Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Arceneaux, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chisholm et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Chisholm
Represented By: Anthony D. Irpino
Represented By: Krystena L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Chisholm
Represented By: Anthony D. Irpino
Represented By: Krystena L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeanne Arceneaux
Represented By: Michael Edward Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?