Lewis v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Samuel Lewis
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2023cv06609
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Darrel James Papillion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Fernandez, Mary)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand and Petition for Damages by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Fernandez, Mary)
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(ko)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. By Clerk.(ko)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Fernandez, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court forTangipahoa Parish, case number 2023-3360 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10248591) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney Mary Katherine Fernandez added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Fernandez, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Lewis
Represented By: Chinwe Onyenekwu
Represented By: Mark Richard Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Mary Katherine Fernandez
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Eugene Gregg Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?