Sharkco Seafood International, LLC, et al v Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Sharkco Seafood International, LLC, KEB, LLC, Bruce Drury and Kevin Drury
Defendant: Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC and Main Pass Oil Gathering Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv07036
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Brandon S Long
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 2701 - Oil Pollution Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' #14 motion to enroll counsel of record is GRANTED. Cheryl M. Kornick (La. Bar No. 19652), Kelly Brechtel Becker (La. Bar No. 27375), and Zachary D. Berryman (La. Bar No. 40278) of the law firm Liskow & Lewis are ENROLLED as counsel of record for Defendants. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 01/04/2024. (js)
January 3, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Main Pass Oil Gathering Company, LLC on 1/3/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Gobeille, Alayne)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC on 1/3/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Gobeille, Alayne)
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Cheryl M. Kornick, Kelly B. Becker, and Zachary D. Berryman by Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Cheryl Mollere Kornick added to party Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC(pty:dft).(Kornick, Cheryl) Modified text on 12/29/2023 (mp).
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Brandon S. Long. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/27/2023.(lag)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Lynn E. Swanson for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/15/2023. (blg)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Lynn E. Swanson (La. Bar No. 22650) by Bruce Drury, Kevin Drury, Sharkco Seafood International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gobeille, Alayne) Modified text on 12/13/2023 (mmv).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #4 Court's November 27, 2023 Order has been satisfied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claims asserted by KEB, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice, based upon Plaintiffs' representation that KEB, LLC has decided not to continue with the litigation for unrelated reasons (R. Doc. 8-1 at p. 1, n.3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #8 Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery is DENIED. The Court finds it unnecessary at this time to grant leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery because jurisdiction exists under 28 U.S.C. 1331. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/11/2023.(mmv)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery pursuant to Order, rec. doc. 4. ** Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for hearing. Clerk has removed hearing date. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'.** (mmv)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery pursuant to Order, rec. doc. 4 by Bruce Drury, Kevin Drury, KEB, LLC, Sharkco Seafood International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Gobeille, Alayne) Modified text/removed submission date on 12/8/2023 (mmv).
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Sharkco Seafood International, LLC, Kevin Drury, Bruce Drury, KEB, LLC.(Jones, Gladstone)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC. (mmv)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Gobeille, Alayne)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have ten (10) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended complaint, without further leave of Court, properly setting forth the citizenship particulars of all of the parties, as required to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case under 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)(2). Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/27/2023.(cs)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Main Pass Oil Gathering Company, LLC, Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mmv)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10288017) filed by Sharkco Seafood International, LLC, Kevin Drury, Bruce Drury, KEB, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC, #3 Summons to Main Pass Oil Gathering Company, LLC)Attorney Gladstone N. Jones, III added to party Bruce Drury(pty:pla), Attorney Gladstone N. Jones, III added to party Kevin Drury(pty:pla), Attorney Gladstone N. Jones, III added to party KEB, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gladstone N. Jones, III added to party Sharkco Seafood International, LLC(pty:pla).(Jones, Gladstone)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharkco Seafood International, LLC, et al v Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharkco Seafood International, LLC
Represented By: Charles Joseph Ballay
Represented By: Alayne K. Gobeille
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: E. Blair Schilling
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett, III
Represented By: D'Ann R Penner
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Lance C. McCardle
Represented By: Michael Peter Arata
Represented By: Rosa E. Acheson
Represented By: Thomas Dixon
Represented By: Lynn E. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEB, LLC
Represented By: Charles Joseph Ballay
Represented By: Alayne K. Gobeille
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: D'Ann R Penner
Represented By: E. Blair Schilling
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett, III
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Lance C. McCardle
Represented By: Michael Peter Arata
Represented By: Rosa E. Acheson
Represented By: Thomas Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Drury
Represented By: Charles Joseph Ballay
Represented By: Alayne K. Gobeille
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: D'Ann R Penner
Represented By: E. Blair Schilling
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett, III
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Lance C. McCardle
Represented By: Michael Peter Arata
Represented By: Rosa E. Acheson
Represented By: Thomas Dixon
Represented By: Lynn E. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Drury
Represented By: Charles Joseph Ballay
Represented By: Alayne K. Gobeille
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: D'Ann R Penner
Represented By: E. Blair Schilling
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett, III
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Lance C. McCardle
Represented By: Michael Peter Arata
Represented By: Rosa E. Acheson
Represented By: Thomas Dixon
Represented By: Lynn E. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Coast Infrastructure, LLC
Represented By: Cheryl Mollere Kornick
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Zachary Dale Berryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Pass Oil Gathering Company, LLC
Represented By: Cheryl Mollere Kornick
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Zachary Dale Berryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?