Jurisich Oysters, LLC et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Jurisich Oysters, LLC, Ameripure Processing Company, Inc., Matthew Tesvich, Earth Island Institute, International Marine Mammal Project, ALERT Project, International Marine Mammal Project of Earth Island Institute and Alert Project of Earth Island Institute
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, National Marine Fisheries Service and United States National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 2:2024cv00106
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS ORDERED that Elizabeth L. Lewis is granted pro hac vice admission as counsel for all Plaintiffs in the above captioned case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (pp)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth L. Lewis (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10403057) by Alert Project of Earth Island Institute, Ameripure Processing Company, Inc., Earth Island Institute, International Marine Mammal Project of Earth Island Institute, Jurisich Oysters, LLC, Matthew Tesvich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Dunbar, Corey)
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States National Marine Fisheries Service. (pp)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to United States National Marine Fisheries Service filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,,,. (Dunbar, Corey)
January 17, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(pp)
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (meb)
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Marine Fisheries Service, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10356179) filed by ALERT Project, Matthew Tesvich, Ameripure Processing Company, Inc., Earth Island Institute, Jurisich Oysters, LLC, International Marine Mammal Project. (Attachments: #1 Summons ACE, #2 Summons FWS, #3 Summons NMFS, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons USAO, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Corey E. Dunbar added to party ALERT Project(pty:pla), Attorney Corey E. Dunbar added to party Ameripure Processing Company, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Corey E. Dunbar added to party Earth Island Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Corey E. Dunbar added to party International Marine Mammal Project(pty:pla), Attorney Corey E. Dunbar added to party Jurisich Oysters, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Corey E. Dunbar added to party Matthew Tesvich(pty:pla).(Dunbar, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jurisich Oysters, LLC et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jurisich Oysters, LLC
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Lewis
Represented By: Ellen Pivach Dunbar
Represented By: John E. Pivach
Represented By: George Pivach, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameripure Processing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Represented By: George Pivach, II
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Lewis
Represented By: Ellen Pivach Dunbar
Represented By: John E. Pivach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Tesvich
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Represented By: Ellen Pivach Dunbar
Represented By: John E. Pivach
Represented By: George Pivach, II
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Lewis
Represented By: Ellen Pivach Dunbar
Represented By: John E. Pivach
Represented By: George Pivach, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Marine Mammal Project
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALERT Project
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Marine Mammal Project of Earth Island Institute
Represented By: George Pivach, II
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar,
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Lewis
Represented By: Ellen Pivach Dunbar
Represented By: John E. Pivach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alert Project of Earth Island Institute
Represented By: John E. Pivach
Represented By: George Pivach, II
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar,
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Lewis
Represented By: Ellen Pivach Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?