Aguilar v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Ivonne Aguilar
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2024cv00514
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1101 Immigration & Nationality Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/15/2024, answer due 5/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Gahagan, Michael)
February 29, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sa)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (kls)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10419077) filed by Ivonne Aguilar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Ivonne Aguilar(pty:pla).(Gahagan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivonne Aguilar
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?