Davis v. Sheriff of Orleans Parish et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Davis
Defendant: Sheriff of Orleans Parish, Warden of Orleans Parish Prison, Orleans Parish Sheriff Department, Medical Director of Orleans Parish Prison and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00637
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Darrel James Papillion
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 6 Partial REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: re #3 Complaint, filed by Calvin Davis. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Davis' claims against defendants, Sheriff of Orleans Parish, Warden of Orleans Parish Prison, and the Orleans Parish Sheriff's Department, be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as legally frivolous and otherwise for failing to state a claim on which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii), and the claim against the unnamed Deputy Sheriff be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failing to state a claim on which relief can be granted.IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Davis' claims against the Medical Director for Orleans Parish Prison and the unidentified Classification Officer be allowed to proceed pending further development and remain referred to the United States Magistrate Judge. Objections to R&R due by 5/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 5/6/2024.(cs) (NEF: Section P)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $7.80 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Calvin Davis in monthly payments as set out in document. The Clerk is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 4/2/2024. (NEF: Financial, cc: Warden)(cs)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Davis. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ss) Image QCd on 3/29/2024 (sdp).
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Medical Director of Orleans Parish Prison, Orleans Parish Sheriff Department, Sheriff of Orleans Parish, Warden of Orleans Parish Prison filed by Calvin Davis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss)
March 14, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint,. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/4/2024. (ss)
March 14, 2024 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against Medical Director of Orleans Parish Prison, Orleans Parish Sheriff Department, Sheriff of Orleans Parish, Warden of Orleans Parish Prison filed by Calvin Davis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Sheriff of Orleans Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Orleans Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Orleans Parish Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orleans Parish Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director of Orleans Parish Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?