Petersen et al v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Petersen, Jr. and Bobbie Petersen
Defendant: Nathan Diaz, John Doe #1, John Doe #2 and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv01151
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/25/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 12/24/2024. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(gla)
June 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE Scheduling Conference reset for 6/28/2024 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(gla)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS ORDERED that Jeremiah T. Reynolds is hereby admitted to the bar of this Court Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Nathan Diaz in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (pp)
June 3, 2024 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeremiah T. Reynolds (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10551043) by Nathan Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #5 Proposed Order)(McIntire, Amy)
May 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2024 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(gla)
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance List of Parties and Pleadings by Nathan Diaz re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McIntire, Amy)
May 7, 2024 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Nathan Diaz.(lb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Nathan Diaz.(McIntire, Amy)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2024-03459 "C-10" (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10514789) filed by Nathan Diaz. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Amy L. McIntire added to party Nathan Diaz(pty:dft).(McIntire, Amy) Modified text on 5/7/2024 (lb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petersen et al v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Petersen, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Justin Egenberg
Represented By: Ben Berman
Represented By: Daniel E. Levy
Represented By: Tanner Mitchell Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Petersen
Represented By: Bradley Justin Egenberg
Represented By: Ben Berman
Represented By: Daniel E. Levy
Represented By: Tanner Mitchell Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Diaz
Represented By: Amy L. McIntire
Represented By: Walter Francis Becker, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremiah T. Reynolds
Represented By: Peter Joseph Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?