Gipson et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Billy Gipson and Tina Gipson
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01340
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brandon S Long
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2024 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion: Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately. (ko)
July 3, 2024 Filing 13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Allied Trust Insurance Company regarding #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
July 2, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Request/Statement of Oral Argument)(Arceneaux, Jeanne) Modified text on 7/3/2024 (ko).
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 21, 2024 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court. (1) Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 7/10/2024. Clerk took corrective action. (2) Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately. (js)
June 21, 2024 Filing 9 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Billy Gipson, Tina Gipson regarding #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (js)
June 20, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Billy Gipson, Tina Gipson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Request for oral argument, #12 Notice of submission, #13 Proposed Order)(Impastato, Dominick) Modified text/submission date on 6/21/2024 (js).
June 19, 2024 Filing 7 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Billy Gipson, Tina Gipson regarding 6 First MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Impastato, Dominick) Modified link on 6/20/2024 (js).
June 19, 2024 Filing 6 **DEFICIENT** First MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court by Billy Gipson, Tina Gipson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Proposed Order)(Impastato, Dominick) Modified on 6/20/2024 (js).
May 23, 2024 Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to Ida CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lb)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC for Allied Trust Insurance Company (Arceneaux, Jeanne)
May 22, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance by Allied Trust Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, 2 Initial Case Assignment. (Arceneaux, Jeanne)
May 22, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Brandon S. Long and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
May 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court Jefferson Parish, case number 845-683 "A" (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10538457) filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jeanne Arceneaux added to party Allied Trust Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Arceneaux, Jeanne) Modified text on 5/23/2024 (lb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipson et al v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Edward Hill
Represented By: Jeanne Arceneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Gipson
Represented By: Dominick F. Impastato, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Gipson
Represented By: Dominick F. Impastato, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?