Hollywood Nails & Spa v. Western World Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hollywood Nails & Spa
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01411
Filed: May 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECUSAL ORDER: The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to reallot the above captioned case to another Magistrate Judge other than Magistrate Judge 4. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/4/2024.(pp)(NEF: Mag Sections 4 & 5)
June 4, 2024 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. ** Multiple pages of exhibit filed sideways. Clerk has corrected image. Please adjust scanner or pdf for future filings. No further action necessary.** (my)
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #2 Notice of Compliance,. **Document filed in error. See rec docs 6 and 7 for correct entries. No further action is necessary.** (my)
June 3, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Western World Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Swanson, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/4/2024) (my).
June 3, 2024 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Western World Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S. Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Western World Insurance Company (Swanson, Christopher)
June 3, 2024 Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to Ida CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lb)
May 31, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (meb)
May 31, 2024 Filing 3 **FILED IN ERROR-SEE REC DOC 6 FOR CORRECT ENTRY**Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Western World Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S. Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Western World Insurance Company (Swanson, Christopher) Modified on 6/4/2024 (my).
May 31, 2024 Filing 2 **FILED IN ERROR-SEE REC DOC 7 FOR CORRECT ENTRY**Notice of Compliance by Western World Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Swanson, Christopher) Modified text on 6/3/2024 (lb). Modified on 6/4/2024 (my).
May 31, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-09048 "D-12" (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10549311) filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Western World's LDOI Profile, #5 Exhibit D - Coverage Declarations, #6 Exhibit E - Sworn Statement of Loss, #7 Exhibit F - September 2022 Partial Denial LetterLetter, #8 Notice to Adverse Party)Attorney Christopher W. Swanson added to party Western World Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Swanson, Christopher) Modified text on 6/3/2024 (lb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollywood Nails & Spa v. Western World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen L. Miles
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Christopher W. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollywood Nails & Spa
Represented By: Charles L Gowland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?