SHREEJI, LLC v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: SHREEJI, LLC doing business as Comfort Suites Airport
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company and Navigators Specialty Insurance Corporation
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01446
Filed: June 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand (Answer to the Petition for Damages) by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Reimonenq, Simeon)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - FOURTH AMENDMENT TO IDA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(jls)
June 6, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (kls)
June 6, 2024 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parents Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., and Navigators Group, Inc. for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text, filer on 6/6/2024 (jls).
June 6, 2024 Filing 3 Amendment/Supplement to Document by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified filer on 6/6/2024 (jls).
June 6, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b) by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified event, filer on 6/6/2024 (jls).
June 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC for the Parish of Jefferson, case number 846-658 H (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10555962) filed by NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service on defendant, #2 Exhibit B - LDI details for Navigators, #3 Exhibit C - SOS records for SHREEJI LLC, #4 Exhibit D - email chain, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Record, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Simeon B. Reimonenq, Jr added to party NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION(pty:dft).(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text, filer on 6/6/2024 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHREEJI, LLC v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHREEJI, LLC doing business as Comfort Suites Airport
Represented By: Ryan Tait Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary T. Lamachio
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Simeon B. Reimonenq, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?